KS S0248 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died on General Orders in House
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died on General Orders in House
Summary
Electronic logging system for sale of methamphetamine precursor. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Electronic logging system for sale of methamphetamine precursor. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died on General Orders in House | |
2009-03-19 | CR: Be passed as am. by Corrections and Juvenile Justice -HJ 341 | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Corrections and Juvenile Justice -HJ 304; Hearing: Wed., 3/18/09, 1:30 p.m., Rm. 535-N | |
2009-03-16 | Received and introduced -HJ 299 | |
2009-03-13 | Engrossed -SJ 328 | |
2009-03-12 | COW: CR be adptd; be further am.; be passed as am. -SJ 311; EFA: Passed as am.; Yeas 37 Nays 3 -SJ 312 | |
2009-03-11 | CR: Be passed as am. by Public Health and Welfare -SJ 296 | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Public Health and Welfare -SJ 139 | |
2009-02-09 | Introduced -SJ 127 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |