KS SB375 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the FORWARD transportation program.
Title
Providing for the FORWARD transportation program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 37 Nay: 2 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hilderbrand was rejected - Yea: 15 Nay: 24 (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hilderbrand was rejected - Yea: 15 Nay: 24 (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-03-17 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 37 Nay: 2 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hilderbrand was rejected Yea: 15 Nay: 24 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hilderbrand |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing continuation: Wednesday, February 19, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 18, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Introduced |