KY HB1 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-04 - Nineteen (19) line items vetoed (Acts Chapter 1)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-04 - Nineteen (19) line items vetoed (Acts Chapter 1)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
The State/Executive Branch Budget: appropriate from the General Fund (Tobacco), General Fund, Restricted Funds, Federal Funds, Road Fund, Bond Funds, Highway Bonds, Agency Bonds, Capital Construction Surplus, Investment Income, and other funds, $58,437,300 in fiscal year 2009-2010, $29,086,946,400 in fiscal year 2010-2011, and $25,258,797,100 in fiscal year 2011-2012, as follows:
Title
AN ACT relating to appropriations and revenue measures providing financing and conditions for the operations, maintenance, support, and functioning of the government of the Commonwealth of Kentucky and its various officers, cabinets, departments, boards, commissions, institutions, subdivisions, agencies, and other state-supported activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-04 | Nineteen (19) line items vetoed (Acts Chapter 1) | |
2010-05-29 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-29 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2010-05-29 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2010-05-29 | received in Senate | |
2010-05-29 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-28 | received in House | |
2010-05-28 | Bill passed 35-0 | |
2010-05-28 | Senate receded from committee amendment (3) | |
2010-05-28 | posted for passage for receding from Senate committee amendment (3) | |
2010-05-28 | to Rules (S) | |
2010-05-28 | received in Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Bill passed 86-7 | |
2010-05-28 | House refused to concur in Senate committee amendment (3) | |
2010-05-28 | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (7) | |
2010-05-28 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendments (3) and (7) | |
2010-05-28 | to Rules (H) | |
2010-05-28 | received in House | |
2010-05-28 | passed 35-1 with Committee Substitute, committee amendments (3) and (7) | |
2010-05-28 | committee amendment committee amendments (1) (2) (4) (5) and (6) withdrawn | |
2010-05-28 | 3rd reading | |
2010-05-28 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, May 28, 2010 | |
2010-05-28 | reported favorably, to Rules with committee amendment (7) | |
2010-05-28 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2010-05-28 | reported favorably, to Rules with committee amendments (5) and (6) | |
2010-05-28 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2010-05-27 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendments (1) (2) (3) and (4) | |
2010-05-27 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2010-05-27 | 2nd reading | |
2010-05-27 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2010-05-26 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2010-05-26 | 1st reading | |
2010-05-26 | taken from Committee on Committees (S) | |
2010-05-26 | received in Senate | |
2010-05-26 | passed 94-4 with Committee Substitute, floor amendments (5) and (6) | |
2010-05-26 | floor amendment (2) ruled not germane | |
2010-05-26 | 3rd reading | |
2010-05-26 | floor amendment (7) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-05-25 | floor amendments (1) (2) (3) (4) (5) and (6) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-05-25 | placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, May 26, 2010 | |
2010-05-25 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute | |
2010-05-24 | posting waived | |
2010-05-24 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2010-05-24 | 1st reading | |
2010-05-24 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2010-05-24 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2010-05-24 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10SS/HB1.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10SS/HB1/bill.doc |