KY HB1 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Propose to amend the Constitution of Kentucky to create a right to hunt, fish, and harvest nonthreatened species using traditional methods; submit to the voters for approval or disapproval.
Title
AN ACT proposing to amend the Constitution of Kentucky relating to hunting, fishing, and harvesting wildlife.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | delivered to Secretary of State | |
2011-03-04 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2011-03-04 | passed 94-1 | |
2011-03-04 | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute | |
2011-03-04 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute | |
2011-03-03 | received in House | |
2011-03-02 | 3rd reading, passed 33-2 with Committee Substitute | |
2011-03-02 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 2, 2011 | |
2011-03-02 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-28 | returned to State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-02-28 | 2nd reading | |
2011-02-28 | taken from State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-02-25 | returned to State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-02-25 | 1st reading | |
2011-02-25 | taken from State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-02-15 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-02-11 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-11 | 3rd reading, passed 91-4 | |
2011-02-09 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 10, 2011 | |
2011-02-09 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-08 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2011-02-03 | posted in committee | |
2011-01-04 | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in House | |
2011-10-06 | To: Interim Joint Committee on State Government |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB1.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB1/bill.doc |