KY HB1 | 2021 | 1st Special Sesison
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-09 - identical Senate Bill 1 substituted for this bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-09 - identical Senate Bill 1 substituted for this bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 13A to nullify 902 KAR 2:213E and 702 KAR 1:195E; direct each school district to have a COVID-19 operations in place; direct the Department for Public Health to develop a model "test to stay" COVID-19 model for school districts; direct local health departments to assist school districts in implementing their COVID-19 operation plans; provide a temporary remote instruction option for school districts to use at the school, classroom, grade, or group level; provide that districts may submit 2018-2019 or 2019-2020 attendance data for the 2021-2022 school year; require all certified staff and classified staff designated by a school district to work on-site during a nontraditional instruction day; for the 2021-2022 school year, temporarily revise requirements for emergency substitute certification, allow instructional activities to be performed by classified staff, and allow a district to temporarily hire staff upon receipt of a preliminary background check; direct the Kentucky State Police and Cabinet for Health and Family Services to prioritize school district background checks; temporarily revise retirement reemployment provisions until January 15, 2022; allow a school district to submit a school calendar plan to receive a waiver of 170 required student attendance days if 1,062 hours are achieved for the 2021-2022 school year; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the delivery of education and care for children and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-09 | House | identical Senate Bill 1 substituted for this bill |
2021-09-09 | House | returned to the Orders of the Day |
2021-09-09 | House | Committee Substitute adopted |
2021-09-09 | House | 3rd reading |
2021-09-09 | House | floor amendments (12), (13), (14), (15), (16), (17), (18) and (19) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-09-09 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2021-09-09 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2021-09-08 | House | returned to Education (H) |
2021-09-08 | House | 2nd reading |
2021-09-08 | House | taken from Education (H) |
2021-09-08 | House | floor amendments (6), (7), (8), (9), (10) and (11) filed |
2021-09-07 | House | floor amendments (1), (2), (3), (4) and (5) filed |
2021-09-07 | House | posting waived |
2021-09-07 | House | to Education (H) |
2021-09-07 | House | 1st reading |
2021-09-07 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-09-07 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-09-07 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Background Checks
Children and Minors
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Effective Dates, Emergency
Public Health
Retirement and Pensions
State Agencies
Teachers
Background Checks
Children and Minors
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Effective Dates, Emergency
Public Health
Retirement and Pensions
State Agencies
Teachers