KY HB100 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 96)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 96)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends KRS 213.141 to establish that a homeless individual as defined in KRS 198A.700, or a homeless youth, as defined in 42 U.S.C. sec. 11434a(2), who is under the age of 25 does not have to pay a fee to get a copy of his or her birth certificate.
Title
AN ACT relating to birth certificates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3125 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 34 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 34 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 96) |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-22 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2024-02-06 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2024-01-26 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-01-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-01-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-01-23 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 24, 2024 |
2024-01-19 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-01-18 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-01-12 | House | to State Government (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | introduced in House |