KY HB105 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.2847 to establish a monthly subsidy for students participating in the Kentucky foster or adopted child public postsecondary tuition waiver program; create a new section of KRS Chapter 199 to define "at -risk male student"; establish the participation and operational requirements of the Mentorship for At-Risk Male Students Grant Program; amend KRS 211.690 to establish the promotion of father engagement activities as a part of the Kentucky HANDS Program; create new sections of KRS Chapter 405 to establish the participation and operational requirements of the Responsible Fatherhood Imitative; establish the participation and operational requirements of a community grant program to address the needs of fathers in the Commonwealth; create a new section of KRS Chapter 600 to require the Department of Juvenile Justice and the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to identify children that are dually involved with both systems of care and provide a report to the General Assembly each year that includes actions taken by both agencies to better serve such children; amend KRS 625.025 to establish new requirements of the youth independent living program operated by the Cabinet for Health and Family Services; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to families and children and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-02-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-01 | House | to Families & Children (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | introduced in House |