KY HB117 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 57)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 57)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 304.3-400 to exempt risk retention groups defined by federal law from the definition of captive insurers; amend KRS 304.37-050 to strengthen the confidentiality of records in the possession or control of the Department of Insurance; authorize the commissioner to share confidential records with state, federal, and international regulatory agencies and law enforcement, and the National Association of Insurance, subject to a written agreement of confidentiality; establish procedures and protocols for sharing information.
Title
AN ACT relating to financial examinations of insurers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 57) |
2015-03-11 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-11 | House | Bill passed 99-0 |
2015-03-11 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-11 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2015-03-11 | House | to Rules (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | received in House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | committee amendment (2) withdrawn |
2015-03-11 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendments (1-title) and (2) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-24 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 |
2015-02-12 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 13, 2015 |
2015-02-12 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 17, 2015 |
2015-02-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-06 | House | posted in committee |
2015-01-08 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2015-01-06 | House | introduced in House |