KY HB117 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-06 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-06 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 141.065 to allow an income tax credit for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2017, but before January 1, 2021, equal to $1,000 for employers who hire certain unemployed individuals, if the individual was employed in the coal industry immediately prior to becoming unemployed; limit the current unemployment tax credit to taxable years beginning before January 1, 2021; define the purpose of the tax credits and data required to determine if the tax credits achieve the purpose; require the Department of Revenue to provide information on these credits to the Legislative Research Commission; amend KRS 141.0205 to order the credit; amend KRS 131.190, 131.135, 131.618, 131.650, 131.990, 141.389, and 131.020 to make various conforming changes.
Title
AN ACT relating to the unemployment tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-06 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2017-01-03 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB117.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/HB117/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/17RS/HB117/FN.pdf |