KY HB122 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 200)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 200)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends KRS 132.010 and 136.010, relating to certain property taxes, to include certain mains, pipes, pipelines, and conduits in the definition of “real property”; amends KRS 132.590 to declare that property valuation administrators (PVAs) are officers whose jurisdiction and duties are coextensive to that of the Commonwealth as stated in Section 246 of the Constitution of Kentucky, to update the PVA salary schedule, to prohibit PVA salaries from exceeding limits in the Constitution and adjusted for inflation by statute, and to provide that certain PVAs who did not receive an eight percent raise in July 2022 and who are still in office receive a lump-sum payment of eight percent of the sum received for the time between the effective date of the Act and July 1, 2022; amends KRS 138.477 to exempt charging stations with a charging capacity of less than 20 kilowatts from the electric vehicle power tax; and applies Section 1 of the Act retroactively to January 1, 2024; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to revenue and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 490 (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 3235 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 237 (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 3235 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 237 (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 200) |
2024-04-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-04-15 | House | passed 80-10 |
2024-04-15 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-04-15 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2024-04-15 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2024-04-15 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | received in House |
2024-04-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-3 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, April 15, 2024 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2024-03-27 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 79-16 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 07, 2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-01-19 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-01-19 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-01-18 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-01-17 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
State Agencies
Taxation
Taxation, Income--Corporate
Taxation, Income--Individual
Taxation, Inheritance and Estate
Taxation, Property
Taxation, Sales and Use
Taxation, Severance
Technical Corrections
Taxation
Taxation, Income--Corporate
Taxation, Income--Individual
Taxation, Inheritance and Estate
Taxation, Property
Taxation, Sales and Use
Taxation, Severance
Technical Corrections