KY HB124 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-29 - to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-29 - to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 100 to allow a planning unit to incorporate airport noise overlay districts within its zoning texts and maps; allow the planning unit to incorporate guidelines on building techniques and materials that are designed to provide acoustical insulation benefits to structures within the overlay.
Title
AN ACT relating to airport noise overlays.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Wayne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) | |
2012-02-27 | received in Senate | |
2012-02-24 | 3rd reading, passed 93-1 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-23 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 24, 2012 | |
2012-02-23 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-22 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-10 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-03 | to Local Government (H) | |
2012-01-03 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB124.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB124/bill.doc |