KY HB130 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-20 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-20 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.315 to exempt the estate of anyone who is eligible for state death gratuity benefits, and the estate of any regular member of the Armed Forces, from probate fees.
Title
AN ACT relating to probate fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-20 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2010-01-19 | received in Senate | |
2010-01-15 | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 | |
2010-01-14 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 15, 2010 | |
2010-01-14 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-01-13 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-01-11 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-11 | posting waived | |
2010-01-05 | to Military Affairs & Public Safety (H) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB130.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB130/bill.doc |