KY HB135 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 15.430 to prohibit the use of funds in the Law Enforcement Foundation Program for any purpose other than those specified.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Law Enforcement Foundation Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-18 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-02-04 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-08 | House | to State Government (H) |
2014-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB135.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB135/bill.doc |