KY HB141 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-10)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 141 to define "donor," "edible agricultural products," "nonprofit food program," and "qualified taxpayer"; allow a qualified taxpayer/donor to receive a tax credit for donating edible agricultural products to nonprofit food programs; set the tax credit amount at ten percent; establish requirements for pass-through entities; describe the forms that shall be used to record donation information; describe standards for estimating the value of donated edible agricultural products; allow a tax credit to be carried forward to subsequent years; amend KRS 141.0205 to specify the ordering of the credit; clarify the farm operation tax credit; make technical corrections.
Title
AN ACT relating to tax credits for farmers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2013-02-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute |
2013-02-20 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2013 |
2013-02-20 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2013-02-15 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-05 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2013-01-11 | House | introduced in House |