KY HB142 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - returned to Health & Family Services (H)
Pending: House Health and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - returned to Health & Family Services (H)
Pending: House Health and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 218A.010 to define "kratom"; amend KRS 218A.1412 to include kratom to the list of controlled substances that are unlawful to traffic; amend KRS 218A.1415 to include kratom in the list of controlled substances that are unlawful for a person to possess.
Title
AN ACT relating to controlled substances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | returned to Health & Family Services (H) |
2022-03-14 | House | 1st reading |
2022-03-14 | House | taken from Health & Family Services (H) |
2022-02-02 | House | to Health & Family Services (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | introduced in House |
2021-12-10 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |