KY HB173 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 33)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 33)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 186.060, regarding official license plates for vehicles leased or owned by local units of government, to clarify the eligibility of vehicles leased by local governments to bear official plates.
Title
AN ACT relating the motor vehicles leased by units of government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 33) |
2013-03-11 | House | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2013-03-06 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2013-03-05 | House | received in House |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 5, 2013 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-21 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2013-02-13 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-07 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-06 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2013-02-05 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB173.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB173/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB173/vote_history.pdf |