KY HB173 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - floor amendment (5) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - floor amendment (5) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 438 to define terms; prohibit indoor smoking in businesses, places of employment, and other listed public places; exempt private residences, unless used for child care or adult day care; permit smoking in designated nonenclosed areas; require posting of "no smoking" signs at specified locations; permit local governments to adopt stricter regulations by ordinance; provide for enforcement by all peace officers and designated health department and local government employees; provide for the issuance of uniform citations for violations; require that employers and others not discriminate against persons reporting violations; provide for fines for violation; provide that fines go to the agency whose employee issued the citation; provide that no court costs or other fees be charged for violations; exempt certain research and manufacturing laboratories and agricultural buildings; amend KRS 344.040, relating to unlawful practices by an employer, to add reference to state law, local ordinance, or local board of health regulation relating to smoking; amend KRS 431.450, relating to uniform citations, to provide for issuing citation forms to health departments; authorize the Department of Kentucky State Police to create and issue uniform smoking violation citations; repeal various statutes permitting smoking in public buildings.
Title
AN ACT prohibiting smoking in public places and places of employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | House | floor amendment (5) filed |
2014-02-13 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 14, 2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | floor amendment (4) filed |
2014-02-10 | House | floor amendments (2) and (3) filed |
2014-02-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-06 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2014-02-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-01-24 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-09 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | introduced in House |