KY HB184 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 104)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 104)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 160.345 to provide an alternative principal selection process for county school districts in a county with a consolidated local government adopted under KRS Chapter 67C; set penalties for a school council member violating confidentiality of the alternative principal selection process; make any discretionary action taken under the alternative method of principal selection subject to provisions of employer-employee bargained contracts between districts and employees.
Title
AN ACT relating to school councils.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 104) |
2016-04-01 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-04-01 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-03-29 | House | passed 98-0 |
2016-03-29 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-28 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate committee amendment (1-title) and Committee Substitute (1) for Tuesday, March 29, 2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | to Rules (H) |
2016-03-25 | House | received in House |
2016-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 24, 2016 |
2016-03-18 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-17 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitutes (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-02-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2016-02-04 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2016-02-03 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 4 |
2016-02-03 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-02 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-01-28 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-11 | House | to Education (H) |
2016-01-07 | House | introduced in House |