KY HB189 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 63)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 63)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 67 to establish criteria for the filing of a petition for a charter county commission, including committee membership, criteria of affidavit, clerk's obligations for petition committee, sufficiency of petition, number of signatures, and clerk's requirements for determining and reporting sufficiency or insufficiency; establish procedures for amendment to a petition in the event of insufficient signatures; make final determination of sufficiency the purview of Circuit Court; require the continued honoring of any contracts, franchises, obligations, or bonds, to include collective bargaining, by a charter county government; require any conflicts to be resolved in a manner that does not impair any rights of parties to contracts; amend KRS 67.825 to prevent a vote to adopt a charter county government in a county containing a unified local government; amend KRS 67.830 to establish petition requirements; establish that elected or appointed officials may serve and vote on charter commission; allow mayors, subject to legislative approval, to make appointments to charter commission; require procedures for dissolution in the plan of the charter county government; prohibit dissolution for a period of at least five years; require that any charter plan be presented within four years; provide that the commission may be extended for six months, if two-thirds of members agree; allow any city whose voters do not approve of the plan to opt out of any charter county government; require that no plan may be presented for five years after the failure of a charter county plan; amend KRS 67.845 to clarify that certain provisions apply only to participating cities; amend KRS 67.855 to clarify that certain provisions apply to only participating cities; amend publication requirements to conform to the provisions of KRS 424.120; amend KRS 67.910 to require unification plan to include procedures for dissolution of plan; establish some requirements for dissolution plan; establish no dissolution for a period of five years; amend KRS 67.918 to prevent the inclusion of any city which voted against unification plan from being included in the unified local government; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2013.
Title
AN ACT relating to merged governments.
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmie Lee [D] | Rep. Tim Moore [R] | Rep. Arnold Simpson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 63) | |
2012-03-30 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-30 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2012-03-29 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2012-03-28 | passed 89-0 | |
2012-03-28 | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2012-03-28 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2012-03-27 | to Rules (H) | |
2012-03-27 | received in House | |
2012-03-26 | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2012-03-26 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 26, 2012 | |
2012-03-22 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-21 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2012-03-05 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2012-02-22 | received in Senate | |
2012-02-21 | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute, floor amendments (1) and (2) | |
2012-02-16 | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-09 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-09 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 10, 2012 | |
2012-02-09 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-08 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-01-09 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-04 | to Local Government (H) | |
2012-01-03 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB189.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB189/bill.doc |