KY HB189 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 92)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 92)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 65.210 to 65.300 to set procedures for interlocal agreements being amended to modify membership of parties to the agreement without seeking approval from the Attorney General or Department for Local Government.
Title
AN ACT relating to interlocal agreements.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas McKee [D] | Rep. David Hale [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-09 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 92) |
2016-03-29 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-03-29 | House | received in House |
2016-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-1 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2016-03-24 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2016-03-23 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2016-03-22 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2016-03-21 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2016-03-18 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 21, 2016 (Consent Orders #2) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-16 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-12 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-02-09 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-02-04 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 9 |
2016-02-04 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2016-02-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-01-21 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-11 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2016-01-07 | House | introduced in House |