KY HB206 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 62)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 62)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new sections of KRS Chapter 403 to enact the Uniform Collaborative Law Act on the recommendation of the National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State Laws, to regulate the use of collaborative law participation agreements as a voluntary form of alternative dispute resolution, and to provide that the Act may be cited as the Uniform Collaborative Law Act.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Uniform Collaborative Law Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3184 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 319 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 319 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 62) |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2024 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-27 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2024-03-27 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 |
2024-03-14 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 15, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2024-01-09 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-09 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Attorneys
Children and Minors
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
Domestic Relations
Parental Rights
Short Titles and Popular Names
Uniform Laws
Children and Minors
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
Domestic Relations
Parental Rights
Short Titles and Popular Names
Uniform Laws