KY HB211 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 14)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 14)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Confirm Executive Order 2013-518, which reorganizes various offices in the Education and Workforce Development Cabinet.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 14) |
2014-03-31 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-31 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2014-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2014-03-28 | House | Bill passed 97-1 |
2014-03-28 | House | Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2014-03-27 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Conference Report |
2014-03-27 | House | received in House |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Bill passed 36-1 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2014-03-27 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Conference Report |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in Senate |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute (2), committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute (2), committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-19 | House | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute (2), committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-03-18 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (2), committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-03-18 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-18 | House | to Rules (H) |
2014-03-18 | House | received in House |
2014-03-17 | Senate | passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (2), committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Committee Substitute (1) withdrawn |
2014-03-17 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2014-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 17, 2014 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2014-03-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 14, 2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-03-12 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2014-03-12 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | 1st reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2014-01-31 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-01-30 | House | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 |
2014-01-29 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 30, 2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-01-29 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-01-28 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-01-22 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-15 | House | to Education (H) |
2014-01-14 | House | introduced in House |