KY HB213 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-26 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-26 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 154 to allow transmission pipeline companies to condemn for lands and materials needed to construct, operate, and maintain a carbon dioxide transmission pipelines; require the proceedings be the same as under the Eminent Domain Act of Kentucky; declare that the pipeline is a public use; amend KRS 154.27.010 to include transmission pipeline under the definition of "eligible project" and define "transmission pipeline"; amend KRS 154.27-020 to require a transmission pipeline to have a capital investment of $50,000,000 to qualify for energy independence incentives; and amend KRS 353.500 to include transmission of carbon dioxide for enhanced oil recovery, sequestration, or other carbon management under the jurisdiction of the state for purposes of regulation.
Title
AN ACT relating to the capture and transportation of carbon dioxide.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | to Rules (H) | |
2010-03-26 | received in House | |
2010-03-26 | 3rd reading, passed 30-8 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-03-26 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 26, 2010 | |
2010-03-25 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-03-23 | returned to Judiciary (S) | |
2010-03-23 | 2nd reading | |
2010-03-23 | taken from committee | |
2010-03-22 | returned to Judiciary (S) | |
2010-03-22 | 1st reading | |
2010-03-22 | taken from committee | |
2010-02-24 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2010-02-22 | received in Senate | |
2010-02-19 | 3rd reading, passed 91-5-1 with Committee Substitute | |
2010-02-16 | placed in the Orders of the Day | |
2010-02-12 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-11 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-02-01 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-11 | to Natural Resources & Environment (H) | |
2010-01-07 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB213.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB213/bill.doc |