KY HB213 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 30)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 30)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 218A.245 to allow KASPER data-sharing agreements with different types of jurisdictions.
Title
AN ACT relating to data-sharing of prescription drug monitoring information.
Sponsors
Rep. Danny Bentley [R] | Rep. Robert Benvenuti [R] | Rep. George Brown [D] | Rep. Daniel Elliott [R] |
Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Kimberly Moser [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 538 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 67 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 67 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 30) |
2018-03-16 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-16 | House | received in House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-01-31 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-01-29 | House | 3rd reading, passed 89-0 |
2018-01-26 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, January 29, 2018 |
2018-01-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-01-23 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-22 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2018-01-18 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB213.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB213/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB213/vote_history.pdf |