KY HB213 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 164)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 164)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 319A to include Kentucky in an interstate compact for licensure as an occupational therapist; set the compact's purpose, definitions, and requirements for state participation; allow a practitioner to hold both a home state license and a compact privilege; authorize active duty military personnel or their spouses to retain a home state during active duty; make the home state the only jurisdiction that may impose adverse action against a license; establish the Occupational Therapy Compact Commission; require the commission to develop, maintain, and use a licensee data system shared by all member states; grant the commission rulemaking power; designate oversight, dispute resolution, and enforcement authority under the compact; fix the effective date of the compact as the date the tenth member state enacts the compact into law; establish the construction, binding effect, and severability of the sections of the compact; amend KRS 319A.140 and 319A.180 to include compact licensure as a means to practice occupational therapy.
Title
AN ACT relating to occupational therapists.
Sponsors
Rep. DJ Johnson [R] | Rep. Kimberly Banta [R] | Rep. Alan Gentry [D] | Rep. Derek Lewis [R] |
Rep. Scott Lewis [R] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Buddy Wheatley [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2323 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 374 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 374 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 164) |
2022-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-30 | House | received in House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-25 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2022-03-25 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | 1st reading |
2022-03-24 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-23 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-23 | House | taken from Rules |
2022-03-23 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-21 | House | returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) |
2022-03-21 | House | 2nd reading |
2022-03-21 | House | taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) |
2022-03-14 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) |
2022-03-14 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-14 | House | 1st reading |
2022-03-14 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Background Checks
Compacts, Interstate
Disabilities and the Disabled
Health and Medical Services
Licensing
Occupations and Professions
Physicians and Practitioners
Compacts, Interstate
Disabilities and the Disabled
Health and Medical Services
Licensing
Occupations and Professions
Physicians and Practitioners