KY HB215 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 143)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 143)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 189.635 to clarify definition of news-gathering organization qualifed to receive vehicle accident reports.
Title
AN ACT relating to vehicle accident reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 143) |
2017-03-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-15 | House | Bill passed 90-3 |
2017-03-15 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2017-03-15 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2017-03-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2017-03-14 | House | received in House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-2 with Committee Substitute |
2017-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 14, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a consent bill |
2017-03-07 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2017-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 23, 2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-16 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-09 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | introduced in House |