KY HB238 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 141)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 141)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 165A.350 to allow the Kentucky Commission on Proprietary Education to condition proprietary school agent surety bonds to recover administrative costs, acquire and maintain student records, and indemnify students and their parents or guardians; permit indemnification when a student is unable to complete courses because the proprietary school ceased operations; amend KRS 165A.360 to authorize the commission to condition proprietary school surety bonds to recover administrative costs and acquire and maintain student records; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to proprietary education and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Phillip Pratt [R] | Rep. Mark Hart [R] | Rep. George Brown [D] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] |
Rep. Jody Richards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 141) |
2017-03-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-15 | House | received in House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2017-03-08 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-03 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2017-03-02 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2017-03-01 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday March 2, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-28 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-27 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-09 | House | to Education (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB238.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/HB238/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB238/vote_history.pdf |