KY HB238 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 54)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 54)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 96.530 allow city utilities boards to consist of either 3 or 5 members, and to specify the appointment of nonresident utility commission members for utility commissions consisting of three members and five members.
Title
AN ACT relating to city utility commission membership.
Sponsors
Rep. DJ Johnson [R] | Rep. Scott Lewis [R] | Rep. Jim Gooch [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1673 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 108 (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 108 (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 54) |
2021-03-11 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-11 | House | received in House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-1 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-03 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2021-03-01 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-24 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-3 with Committee Substitute |
2021-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 23, 2021 |
2021-02-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-02-02 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-02 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2021-01-09 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-09 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Boards and Commissions
Cities
Energy
Local Government
Public Officers and Employees
Public Utilities
Public Works
Cities
Energy
Local Government
Public Officers and Employees
Public Utilities
Public Works