KY HB239 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title), floor amendment (1) for Monday, March 29, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title), floor amendment (1) for Monday, March 29, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to designate the last Wednesday in August as Kentucky Literacy Day to be observed by all public schools in the state.
Title
AN ACT relating to literacy.
Sponsors
Rep. John Carney [R] | Rep. James Glenn [D] | Rep. Derrick Graham [D] | Rep. Jody Richards [D] |
Rep. Tom Riner [D] | Rep. Carl Rollins [D] | Rep. Kent Stevens [D] | Rep. Wilson Stone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title), floor amendment (1) for Monday, March 29, 2010 | |
2010-03-24 | to Rules (H) | |
2010-03-24 | received in House | |
2010-03-23 | 3rd reading, passed 19-14 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title), and floor amendment (1) | |
2010-03-22 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 23, 2010 | |
2010-03-19 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-18 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-03-11 | returned to Education (S) | |
2010-03-11 | 2nd reading | |
2010-03-11 | taken from committee | |
2010-03-10 | returned to Education (S) | |
2010-03-10 | 1st reading | |
2010-03-10 | taken from committee | |
2010-02-16 | to Education (S) | |
2010-02-11 | received in Senate | |
2010-02-10 | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2010-02-03 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 10, 2010 | |
2010-02-03 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-02 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-01-28 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-13 | to Education (H) | |
2010-01-12 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB239.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB239/bill.doc |