KY HB239 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 198B to establish requirements for projects requiring structural steel welding such as certification of welders and certified inspectors; provide definitions.
Title
AN ACT relating to welding safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Bobby McCool [R] | Rep. Chris Harris [D] | Rep. Danny Bentley [R] | Rep. Terri Branham Clark [D] |
Rep. McKenzie Cantrell [D] | Rep. Phillip Pratt [R] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] | Rep. Buddy Wheatley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 108 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2019-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-15 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-06 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Contracts
Housing, Building, and Construction
Labor and Industry
Local Mandate
Occupations and Professions
Housing, Building, and Construction
Labor and Industry
Local Mandate
Occupations and Professions