KY HB253 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 217.186 to allow a person or agency, including a first responder or peace officer, to recive a prescription for naloxone, carry equipment needed to administer it, and administer naloxone to a third party suffering from an apparent overdose; require that prescribers include information that encourages individuals to transport someone suffering from an overdose to the hospital even after administering naloxone; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to naloxone administration and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. David Watkins [D] | Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. George Brown [D] | Rep. Thomas Burch [D] |
Rep. James Glenn [D] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Arnold Simpson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | to Rules (H) |
2015-03-23 | House | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-02-24 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 26, 2015 |
2015-02-23 | House | returned to Rules |
2015-02-23 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 24, 2015 |
2015-02-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-09 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-05 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB253.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB253/bill.doc |