KY HB253 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 189 to require local law enforcement agencies having jurisdiction to investigate all traffic accidents involving a fatality that occur on state-maintained highways; specify that if a local law enforcement agency does not have an accident reconstruction unit or similar expertise, the Kentucky State Police shall perform the investigation; amend KRS 16.065 to conform; cite as the John Carter Knight Act of 2020.
Title
AN ACT relating to the investigation of traffic accidents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 151 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-27 | House | passed 91-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (2) |
2020-02-27 | House | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2020-02-27 | House | 3rd reading |
2020-02-24 | House | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-02-21 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-02-20 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 21, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-27 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-16 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2020-01-14 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
Local Mandate
Motor Vehicles
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, State
Short Titles and Popular Names
Traffic Safety
Transportation
Local Mandate
Motor Vehicles
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, State
Short Titles and Popular Names
Traffic Safety
Transportation