KY HB26 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 55)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 55)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 161.158 to specify that school district employees considered full-time under the federal Affordable Care Act shall be eligible for the state-funded contribution for the state health insurance plan offered by the school district.
Title
AN ACT relating to school district employee health insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Bart Rowland [R] | Rep. Rick Nelson [D] | Rep. John Carney [R] | Rep. Ron Crimm [R] |
Rep. Jeff Greer [D] | Rep. Wilson Stone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 55) |
2014-03-27 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2014-03-27 | House | received in House |
2014-03-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 26, 2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2014-03-24 | Senate | returned to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2014-03-24 | Senate | taken from Banking & Insurance (S) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | returned to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | 1st reading |
2014-03-21 | Senate | taken from Banking & Insurance (S) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-4 |
2014-03-11 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 13, 2014 |
2014-03-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-03-04 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-07 | House | to State Government (H) |
2014-01-07 | House | introduced in House |