KY HB264 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 31)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 31)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 12.020, 12.252, 224.10-020, 336.015, and 336.020 to abolish the Office of General Administration and Program Support for Shared Services and all of its divisions and abolish the Office of Inspector General for Shared Services for the Energy and Environmental Cabinet, Labor Cabinet, and Public Protection Cabinet and create new offices and divisions within each cabinet to handle the services previously handled by GAPS; confirm Executive Orders 2017-745, 2017-746, 2017-747, 2017-748, and 2017-855.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 539 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 134 (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 134 (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 31) |
2018-03-16 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-16 | House | received in House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-16 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-02-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-1 |
2018-02-13 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 14, 2018 |
2018-02-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-06 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-31 | House | to State Government (H) |
2018-01-29 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB264.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB264/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB264/vote_history.pdf |