KY HB272 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - posted in committee
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - posted in committee
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 161.158 to authorize each district board of education to determine the group insurance plan offered to its employees.
Title
AN ACT relating to board of education employee insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Riley [R] | Rep. Derek Lewis [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] | Rep. Steve Sheldon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-04 | House | reassigned to Local Government (H) |
2020-01-21 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2020-01-16 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hb272.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hb272/orig_bill.pdf |