KY HB272 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 158)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 158)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 278 to allow a water district formed pursuant to KRS Chapter 74 or a water association formed pursuant to KRS Chapter 273 to charge a late payment charge of 10% of the amount billed; specify that the late payment charge meet certain requirements; prohibit the Public Service Commission from modifying, rejecting, or suspending late payment charges established by tariff.
Title
AN ACT relating to utility services.
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Bray [R] | Rep. Derek Lewis [R] | Rep. Ryan Dotson [R] | Rep. Daniel Fister [R] |
Rep. Mark Hart [R] | Rep. Samara Heavrin [R] | Rep. Thomas Huff [R] | Rep. DJ Johnson [R] |
Rep. William Lawrence [R] | Rep. Suzanne Miles [R] | Rep. Brandon Reed [R] | Rep. Steve Sheldon [R] |
Rep. Billy Wesley [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1817 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 397 (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 396 (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 363 (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1769 (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 155 (Y: 70 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 397 (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 396 (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 363 (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1769 (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 155 (Y: 70 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 158) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-29 | Senate | received in House |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill passed 24-12 |
2021-03-29 | House | veto overridden |
2021-03-29 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2021-03-29 | House | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-29 | House | received in Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Bill passed 69-26 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | veto overridden |
2021-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2021-03-29 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | received in House |
2021-03-23 | House | Vetoed |
2021-03-16 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | passed 71-23 |
2021-03-16 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-16 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-16 | House | taken from Rules |
2021-03-16 | House | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-16 | House | received in House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 25-10 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 16, 2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | returned to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | taken from Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | returned to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | taken from Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | 3rd reading, passed 70-25 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-02-23 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-02-02 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-02 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2021-01-13 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-13 | House | introduced in House |