KY HB272 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 139.480 to exempt currency and bullion from sales and use tax; EFFECTIVE August 1, 2022.
Title
AN ACT relating to the taxation of currency and bullion.
Sponsors
Rep. Norma Kirk-McCormick [R] | Rep. Myron Dossett [R] | Rep. Ryan Dotson [R] | Rep. Patrick Flannery [R] |
Rep. Thomas Huff [R] | Rep. Tom Smith [R] | Rep. Killian Timoney [R] | Rep. Billy Wesley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-03-14 | House | 1st reading |
2022-03-14 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-02-07 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-01-11 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-11 | House | introduced in House |