KY HB273 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 78)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 78)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.878 to exclude from the Open Records Act photographs or videos that depict a person's death, killing, rape, or sexual assault or abuse; cite as the Bailey Holt-Preston Cope Victims Privacy Act; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to public records and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 347 (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa1 RSN# 1724 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 45 (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa1 RSN# 1724 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 45 (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 78) |
2021-03-16 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-16 | House | passed 82-10 |
2021-03-16 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1) |
2021-03-16 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1) |
2021-03-16 | House | taken from Rules |
2021-03-15 | House | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-15 | House | received in House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1) |
2021-03-12 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-03-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-09 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-1 |
2021-02-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 9, 2021 |
2021-02-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-02 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2021-01-13 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-13 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Crime Victims
Effective Dates, Emergency
Local Mandate
Public Records and Reports
Short Titles and Popular Names
Effective Dates, Emergency
Local Mandate
Public Records and Reports
Short Titles and Popular Names