KY HB278 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 12.020 and 12.023 to transfer the Governor's Scholars Program from the Office of the Governor to the Education and Workforce Development Cabinet; amend KRS 158.796 to conform; confirm Executive Order 2011-355.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 71) | |
2012-03-30 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-30 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2012-03-29 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2012-03-28 | received in House | |
2012-03-28 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 | |
2012-03-28 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 28, 2012 | |
2012-03-27 | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill | |
2012-02-08 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2012-02-08 | 2nd reading | |
2012-02-08 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2012-02-07 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2012-02-07 | 1st reading | |
2012-02-07 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2012-02-06 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2012-02-01 | received in Senate | |
2012-01-31 | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 | |
2012-01-27 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 31, 2012 | |
2012-01-27 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-01-26 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-01-24 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-20 | to State Government (H) | |
2012-01-18 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB278.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB278/bill.doc |