KY HB28 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 75)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 75)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 6.611 to implement the "no cup of coffee" rule for legislators, limit allowable payments for attendance of individual legislators to events held in-state, define "in-state" and include administrative regulations and legislative proposals not introduced in the General Assembly to the definition of "legislation"; amend KRS 6.747 to specify that the legislative agent or employer may not furnish out-of-state transportation or lodging for a legislator with certain exceptions; amend KRS 6.767 to prohibit a legislator, candidate, or campaign committee from accepting a campaign contribution from an executive agency lobbyist, or an employer of a legislative agent or executive agency lobbyist during a regular session of the General Assembly, except for a special election held during a regular session of the General Assembly; amend KRS 6.811 to prohibit a legislative agent or employer from giving anything of value to a legislative candidate, prohibit a legislative agent from soliciting, controlling, or delivering a campaign contribution, prohibit an employer of a legislative agent from making a campaign contribution to a legislator, candidate, campaign committee, or caucus campaign committee during a regular session of the General Assembly, and delete language allowing legislative agents and their employers to purchase food or beverages for legislators not to exceed $100 ("no cup of coffee" rule); amend KRS 6.821 to conform, and to include the cost of advertising during a General Assembly by an employer of a legislative agent or their affiliates in the employer's statement filed with the Legislative Ethics Commission..
Title
AN ACT relating to the Code of Legislative Ethics.
Sponsors
Rep. Brent Yonts [D] | Rep. Mitchel Denham [D] | Rep. James Glenn [D] | Rep. Jeff Hoover [R] |
Rep. Martha King [D] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 75) |
2014-03-31 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-31 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2014-03-31 | House | passed 95-0 |
2014-03-31 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2014-03-31 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2014-03-31 | House | to Rules (H) |
2014-03-31 | House | received in House |
2014-03-31 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-1 with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-31 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 31, 2014 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill |
2014-03-27 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2014-03-27 | Senate | 1st reading |
2014-03-27 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 7, 2014 |
2014-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-02-18 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-07 | House | to State Government (H) |
2014-01-07 | House | introduced in House |