KY HB28 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-07 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-07 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 139.200 to provide for a sales and use tax rate of eight percent (8%) on or after January 1, 2021; amend KRS 139.230 and 139.310 to conform; amend KRS 139.471 to provide a six percent (6%) sales tax rate on property purchased for use in the performance of a lump sum, fixed fee contract, sales made under a fixed fee contract, or sales made under a fixed price contract, if the contracts were executed on or before July 10, 2019; amend 138.460 to provide for a motor vehicle usage tax rate of eight percent (8%) on vehicles purchased on or after January 1, 2021; amend KRS 138.463 to provide for an eight percent (8%) U-Drive-It tax rate for rental and leasehold contracts entered into after January 1, 2021; amend KRS 139.260 and 139.470 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to an increase in tax rates.
Sponsors
Rep. John Sims [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-07 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-07-12 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hb28.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hb28/orig_bill.pdf |