KY HB281 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 62)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 62)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 146.560 to allow the Kentucky Heritage Land Conservation Fund to make grants to private, nonprofit land trust organizations; require dollar-for-dollar match of funds allocated; amend KRS 146.570 to allow the board to promulgate administrative regulations to allow grants to be made to private, nonprofit land trust organizations that match dollar-for-dollar.
Title
AN ACT relating to land conservation and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Hall [D] | Rep. Steven Riggs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 62) |
2013-03-12 | House | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-12 | House | received in House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2013-03-05 | Senate | returned to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | taken from Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2013-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-1 |
2013-02-21 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2013-02-19 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2013 |
2013-02-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-12 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-11 | House | to Tourism Development & Energy (H) |
2013-02-07 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB281.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB281/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB281/vote_history.pdf |