KY HB309 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of Subtitle 12 of KRS Chapter 304 to define "retained asset account"; preclude an insurer from using a retained asset account as the mode of settlement of payment to a life insurance beneficiary unless the insurer discloses the use of a retained asset account to the beneficiary or the beneficiary's legal representative prior to the transfer of life insurance proceeds to a retained asset account; require an insurer to inform a beneficiary of the right to receive a lump-sum payment of life insurance proceeds in the form of a bank check or similar other immediate full payment of benefits; require insurers to disclose all payment options available to beneficiaries, in written or electronic format, upon the distribution of anything other than a lump-sum payment of life insurance proceeds; set forth specific disclosure requirements upon the use of a retained asset account rather than a lump-sum payment; establish annual insurer reporting requirements to the Department of Insurance regarding retained asset accounts; require all marketing materials, disclosure statements, and supplemental contract forms utilized in connection with retained asset accounts to be filed with the Department of Insurance prior to their use; authorize the commissioner to disapprove any materials, statements, or forms that are inconsistent with the provisions of the section or are otherwise untrue, unfair, deceptive, false, or misleading; require insurers to return any balance held in a retained asset account to the beneficiary if no funds are withdrawn from the account, or if no affirmative directive has been provided to the insurer by the beneficiary, during any continuous 3 year period; authorize the commissioner to promulgate administrative regulations; provide a short tile of the "Beneficiaries Bill of Rights."
Title
AN ACT relating to life insurance beneficiaries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | signed by Governor | |
2011-03-04 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-03-04 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2011-03-04 | received in House | |
2011-03-04 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 | |
2011-03-03 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 4, 2011 | |
2011-03-02 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-03-01 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | to Banking & Insurance (S) | |
2011-02-18 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-18 | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 | |
2011-02-17 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 18, 2011 | |
2011-02-17 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-16 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2011-02-10 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-03 | to Banking & Insurance (H) | |
2011-02-02 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB309.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB309/bill.doc |