KY HB309 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 365 to establish definitions relating to peer-to-peer car sharing; establish insurance, disclosure, recordkeeping, verification, and equipment liability requirements for peer-to-peer car sharing programs; establish requirements for shared vehicle owners that receive an actual notice of safety recall on a shared vehicle; establish an exemption for peer-to-peer car sharing programs and shared vehicle owners from vicarious liability; create a new section of Subtitle 39 of KRS Chapter 304 to establish certain rights of insurers relating to accidents involving shared vehicles; establish certain requirements for insurers that issue policies covering shared vehicles; create a new section of Subtitle 14 of KRS Chapter 304 to provide peer-to-peer car sharing programs with an insurable interest in shared vehicles during the car sharing period; amend KRS 138.462 and 186.630 to conform; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2023.
Title
AN ACT relating to peer-to-peer car sharing.
Sponsors
Rep. Bart Rowland [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | returned to Rules |
2022-03-10 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-09 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 10, 2022 |
2022-02-25 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-02-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-02-22 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2022-01-18 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-18 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Consumer Affairs
Effective Dates, Delayed
Insurance, Motor Vehicle
Local Mandate
Motor Vehicles
Traffic Safety
Transportation
Effective Dates, Delayed
Insurance, Motor Vehicle
Local Mandate
Motor Vehicles
Traffic Safety
Transportation