KY HB317 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 341.380 to reduce the percentage used to set weekly benefit rate, to increase trigger amounts for the trust fund balance as related to the weekly benefits amount; to reduce the number of times to pay weekly benefits from 26 to 20; to tier down payments beginning at 125% of the weekly benefit rate for 5 weeks to 100% for the following 5 weeks then to 75 % for the third 5 weeks and 50% of the weekly benefits for the remainder of the award, except for employees classified as recall employees who receive 100% of the weekly benefit; provide that certain classified employees cannot change classification during benefit year; and if extended benefits have are federal funded, that the secretary may extend the number of times to pay to 26.
Title
AN ACT relating to re-employment assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | floor amendments (1), (2), (3), (4) and (5) filed |
2019-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25 2019 |
2019-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-19 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-15 | House | to Small Business & Information Technology (H) |
2019-02-12 | House | introduced in House |