KY HB317 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 49)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 49)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 304.17A-255 to require health benefit plans to accept, and count toward the insured's contributions, premium and cost-sharing payments made on behalf of an insured from organizations that meet specified requirements; provide that Act applies to health benefit plans issued or renewed on or after effective date of Act.
Title
AN ACT relating to the payment of insurance premiums and cost sharing on behalf of an insured.
Sponsors
Rep. Kimberly Moser [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] | Rep. Nancy Tate [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2200 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 82 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 82 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 49) |
2022-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-24 | House | received in House |
2022-03-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2022-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-01 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-02-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 89-0 |
2022-02-01 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 02, 2022 |
2022-01-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-01-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-19 | House | to Health & Family Services (H) |
2022-01-19 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-19 | House | introduced in House |