KY HB318 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 15)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 15)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 36 to describe the purposes of Bluegrass Station Division; amend KRS 56.820 to allow the secretary of the Finance and Administration Cabinet to approve modifications to certain existing buildings if the source of payments for the improvements are through an agreement with an agency of the United States government; require the secretary to report any lease modification to the Legislative Research Commission within 30 days; EMERGENCY
Title
AN ACT relating to military affairs and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 15) |
2014-03-21 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-21 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2014-03-20 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2014-03-19 | House | received in House |
2014-03-18 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 18, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-03-05 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2014-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 26, 2014 |
2014-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-02-10 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-04 | House | to Economic Development (H) |
2014-02-03 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB318.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB318/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB318/vote_history.pdf |