KY HB320 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 114)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 114)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 205 to establish hospital rate improvement programs that require hospitals to pay an assessment into a fund to be used as state matching dollars for federal Medicaid funds; establish formulas for collection of the assessments and for making supplemental payments to hospitals; condition the program on federal approval; create the hospital Medicaid assessment fund to be administered by the Department for Medicaid Services; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to hospital rate improvement programs and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. John Carney [R] | Rep. Mark Hart [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] | Rep. Phillip Pratt [R] |
Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] | Rep. Brandon Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 320 (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 932 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 104 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 932 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 104 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 114) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-13 | House | passed 93-4 |
2019-03-13 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-12 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-07 | House | to Rules (H) |
2019-03-07 | House | received in House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill |
2019-03-05 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2019-02-20 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-13 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-13 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2019-02-12 | House | introduced in House |