KY HB328 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 35)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 35)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 224.10-100 to authorize the secretary or designee to enter into, execute, and enforce reciprocal agreements with other states relating to compliance with KRS Chapters 350, 351, and 352 and the administrative regulations promulgated under those chapters.
Title
AN ACT relating to reciprocal interstate agreements pertaining to coal mining.
Sponsors
Rep. Fitz Steele [D] | Rep. Keith Hall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 35) |
2014-03-26 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2014-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2014-03-24 | House | received in House |
2014-03-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 21, 2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2014-03-18 | Senate | returned to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | taken from Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | 1st reading |
2014-03-17 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2014-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 13, 2012 |
2014-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-02-26 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-05 | House | to Natural Resources & Environment (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB328.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB328/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB328/vote_history.pdf |