KY HB328 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 78.510 to provide that the participation date in the County Employees Retirement System (CERS) for those individuals who entered the Kentucky Department of Criminal Justice Training's Police Corps program prior to July 1, 2003, through an agreement with a CERS employer, and who subsequently began participating in CERS as a sworn officer upon completion of the program, shall be the date training began in the Police Corps program.
Title
AN ACT relating to membership dates in the state-administered retirement systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 194 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-09 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2023-03-08 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 09, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-07 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2023-02-23 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2023-02-15 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-15 | House | introduced in House |